Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/06/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/06/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/06/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/06/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/06/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/12/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/24/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 02/25/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 02/25/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 03/05/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/10/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/11/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/12/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/24/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/21/2014