Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/05/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/05/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/10/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/10/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/11/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/11/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/11/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/11/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/12/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/12/2014