Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/27/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/27/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 04/02/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 04/07/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/09/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/13/2014