Text: S.Res.373 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (03/05/2014)


113th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. RES. 373

Recognizing the importance of biosecurity and agro-defense in the United States.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
March 5, 2014

Mr. Roberts (for himself, Mr. Moran, Mr. Blunt, and Mrs. McCaskill) submitted the following resolution; which was considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Recognizing the importance of biosecurity and agro-defense in the United States.

Whereas following the September 11, 2001 terrorist attacks, the United States increased its efforts to combat the threat of global terrorism;

Whereas the September 11th attacks illustrated the vulnerability of the food supply and agriculture economy of the United States;

Whereas in 2002, Congress created the Department of Homeland Security to improve the Government's ability to respond to threats facing the United States;

Whereas the Department of Homeland Security, in partnership with the Department of Agriculture, was quick to recognize the threat posed by agroterrorism;

Whereas on January 30, 2004, President George W. Bush issued a Homeland Security Presidential Directive entitled “Defense of United States Agriculture and Food”;

Whereas the Commission on the Prevention of Weapons of Mass Destruction Proliferation and Terrorism stated in a 2008 report that bioterrorism was a more likely threat to the United States than nuclear terrorism, and higher priority should therefore be given to efforts to combat bioterrorism;

Whereas the threat of a terrorist attack on the United States persists, and continued vigilance is necessary; and

Whereas construction of the National Bio and Agro-Defense Facility began on May 28, 2013: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That it is the sense of the Senate that—

(1) as the United States combats terrorism in all forms and around the world, the safety, security, and health of our livestock and agriculture commodities must not be forgotten;

(2) research and investment in biosecurity and agro-defense should be supported by Congress;

(3) providing the resources, both intellectually and materially, for the advancement of vaccines and cures for deadly pathogens and emerging zoonotic diseases is an integral part of homeland defense;

(4) without the tools necessary to protect the people, agriculture economy, and food supply of the United States, this Nation remains vulnerable to attack;

(5) the world depends on the agriculture of the United States;

(6) the world depends on the leadership of the United States in science and technology;

(7) the United States must remain a leader in the fight against bioterrorism; and

(8) biosecurity and a strong agro-defense system are achievable goals for the United States in the global war on terrorism.