Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/25/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/26/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/31/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/01/2014