Text: S.Res.389 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (03/13/2014)


113th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. RES. 389


Designating the week of March 9, 2014, through March 15, 2014, as “National Youth Synthetic Drug Awareness Week”.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

March 13, 2014

Ms. Klobuchar (for herself, Mr. Grassley, and Mrs. Feinstein) submitted the following resolution; which was considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Designating the week of March 9, 2014, through March 15, 2014, as “National Youth Synthetic Drug Awareness Week”.

    Whereas around the United States, there have been many incidents of violent acts, some leading to serious injury and death, committed by people under the influence of synthetic drugs;

    Whereas the effects of synthetic drugs on their users include elevated heart rate and blood pressure, hallucinations, seizures, and extreme agitation;

    Whereas a lack of public understanding of the potential harm of synthetic drugs makes raising public awareness about the dangers posed by such drugs extremely important;

    Whereas deceptive marketing by sellers of synthetic drugs and easy access to synthetic drugs online and in many convenience stores create a false perception, particularly among youth, that synthetic drugs are legal and safer than street drugs;

    Whereas in 2010, 18-year-old David Rozga of Indianola, Iowa, committed suicide shortly after ingesting a synthetic drug called “K2”, making his death one of the first in the United States linked to synthetic drugs;

    Whereas March 17, 2014, marks the third anniversary of the tragic death of 19-year-old Trevor Robinson, who overdosed on a synthetic drug called “2C–E” at a house party in Blaine, Minnesota;

    Whereas in addition to Trevor Robinson, 10 other teens and young adults at the same house party had to be rushed to hospitals after snorting the same drug, illustrating the urgent need to raise awareness among youth about the dangers of synthetic drugs;

    Whereas according to the 2012 Monitoring the Future survey of youth drug-use trends, 1 in every 9 United States high school seniors surveyed admitted to using synthetic marijuana in the past year;

    Whereas according to a 2013 report by the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Administration Drug Abuse Warning Network, there were 28,531 emergency department visits involving a synthetic cannabinoid product and 22,904 emergency department visits involving bath salts in 2011; and

    Whereas educating the public, and especially our youth, on the dangers of synthetic drugs and promoting prevention of synthetic drug abuse are critical components of what must be a multi-pronged effort to curb synthetic drug abuse: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the Senate—

(1) designates the week of March 9, 2014, through March 15, 2014, as “National Youth Synthetic Drug Awareness Week”; and

(2) urges communities to carry out appropriate programs and activities to educate parents and youth about the dangers associated with synthetic drug abuse.