Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/03/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/03/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/22/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/22/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/22/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/22/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 01/22/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/22/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/22/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 01/22/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 01/22/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 01/22/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/22/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/22/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/22/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/22/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 01/22/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/23/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 01/24/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 01/24/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/11/2013