Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/07/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 04/07/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/07/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/07/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/07/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/08/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/08/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/20/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/05/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/08/2014