There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.412. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/10/2014)

States that the Senate: (1) condemns coercive actions or the use of force to impede freedom of operations in international airspace to alter the status quo or to destabilize the Asia-Pacific region; (2) urges China to refrain from implementing the declared East China Sea Air Defense Identification Zone and to refrain from taking similar provocative actions elsewhere in the Asia-Pacific region; (3) commends Japan and the Republic of Korea for their restraint; and (4) calls on China to withdraw its Hai Yang Shi You (HD-981) drilling rig and associated maritime forces from their current positions, refrain from maritime maneuvers contrary to the Convention on the International Regulations for Preventing Collisions at Sea, and return to the status quo as it existed before May 1, 2014.

Sets forth U.S. policy regarding: (1) supporting allies and partners in the Asia-Pacific region; (2) opposing claims that impinge on the rights, freedoms, and lawful use of the sea; (3) managing disputes without intimidation or force; (4) supporting development of regional institutions to build cooperation and reinforce the role of international law; and (5) assuring continuity of operations by the United States in the Asia-Pacific region.

States that nothing in this resolution shall be construed as a declaration of war or authorization to use force.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/10/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4440-4442)
05/20/2014 Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with amendments and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
04/07/2014 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date
07/10/2014 Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4440-4442)
07/10/2014 S.Amdt.3555 Amendment SA 3555 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/10/2014 S.Amdt.3555 Amendment SA 3555 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S4439-4442; text: CR S4439-4440)
07/10/2014 The committee reported amendment to the preamble was agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text as reported in Senate: CR S4436-4438)
07/10/2014 S.Amdt.3554 Amendment SA 3554 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/10/2014 S.Amdt.3554 Amendment SA 3554 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Paul. (consideration: CR S4439; text: CR S4439)
07/10/2014 S.Amdt.3553 Amendment SA 3553 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/10/2014 S.Amdt.3553 Amendment SA 3553 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S4439; text: CR S4439)
07/10/2014 The committee reported amendments were agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
07/10/2014 Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4436-4442)
05/20/2014 Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 380.
05/20/2014 Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with amendments and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
05/20/2014 Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. Markup report CQ
04/07/2014 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2198-2199)

Titles (1)

Official Titles:

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced:

A resolution reaffirming the strong support of the United States Government for freedom of navigation and other internationally lawful uses of sea and airspace in the Asia-Pacific region, and for the peaceful diplomatic resolution of outstanding territorial and maritime claims and disputes.


Subjects (15)

  • Alliances
  • Asia
  • Aviation and airports
  • China
  • Congressional tributes
  • Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
  • International law and treaties
  • International organizations and cooperation
  • Japan
  • Military assistance, sales, and agreements
  • Military operations and strategy
  • Navigation, waterways, harbors
  • Pacific Ocean
  • South Korea

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 04/07/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/07/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/07/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 04/07/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/20/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/21/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/23/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations04/07/2014 Referred to
05/20/2014 Markup by
05/20/2014 Reported by

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.