Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 06/11/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/11/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/12/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/12/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/12/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/12/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 06/12/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/12/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/12/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/16/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/17/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 06/18/2014