There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate regarding United States support for the State of Israel as it defends itself against unprovoked rocket attacks from the Hamas terrorist organization.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/17/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4626)
07/16/2014 Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/10/2014 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
07/17/2014 Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4626)
07/16/2014 Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 469.
07/16/2014 Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/16/2014 Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/10/2014 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4417)

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/10/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 07/10/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/14/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/14/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/14/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/14/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/14/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/14/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/14/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/14/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/14/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 07/14/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/14/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/14/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/14/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/14/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/14/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 07/15/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 07/15/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/15/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 07/15/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/15/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 07/15/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/15/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/15/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/15/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/16/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/16/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/16/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/16/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/16/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/16/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/17/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/17/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/17/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/17/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/17/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/17/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/21/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations07/10/2014 Referred to
07/16/2014 Markup by
07/16/2014 Reported by

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (8)

  • Arab-Israeli relations
  • Conflicts and wars
  • Gaza Strip
  • Israel
  • Middle East
  • Palestinians
  • Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.498. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/17/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Reaffirms the support of the Senate for Israel's right to defend its citizens and ensure Israel's survival.

Condemns the unprovoked rocket fire at Israel and calls on Hamas to cease all rocket and other attacks against Israel.

Calls on Palestinian Authority (PA) President Mahmoud Abbas to dissolve the unity governing arrangement with Hamas and condemn the attacks on Israel.