Text: S.Res.513 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (07/31/2014)


113th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. RES. 513


Honoring the 70th anniversary of the Warsaw Uprising.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

July 23, 2014

Ms. Mikulski (for herself, Mr. Cardin, Mr. Risch, Mr. Kirk, Mr. Murphy, Mr. Durbin, Mrs. Shaheen, Mr. Rubio, and Mr. Portman) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations

July 29, 2014

Reported by Mr. Menendez, without amendment

July 31, 2014

Considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Honoring the 70th anniversary of the Warsaw Uprising.

    Whereas August 1, 2014, marks the 70th anniversary of the Warsaw Uprising, a heroic event during World War II during which citizens of Poland, against all odds, fought against the Nazi occupation of Warsaw;

    Whereas, on August 1, 1944, the Polish Home Army, with limited supplies and armed with mostly homemade weapons, rose up against the Nazis to fight the nationwide occupation of Poland by Nazi Germany;

    Whereas the Polish resistance fought German forces for 63 days, suffering extreme hardship, retribution, and personal sacrifice, and during which approximately 250,000 Poles were killed, wounded, or went missing;

    Whereas Adolf Hitler ordered the destruction of Warsaw as punishment for the uprising, leaving 85 percent of the city of Warsaw in ruins, including many historical buildings and monuments;

    Whereas the actions of the Polish resistance inspire people throughout the world who fight for freedom and democracy; and

    Whereas the actions of the Polish people during the Warsaw Uprising were a significant contribution to Allied war efforts during World War II and those actions continue to be respected and remembered throughout Poland: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the Senate recognizes the 70th anniversary of the Warsaw Uprising, which occurred during World War II and serves as a symbol of heroism and the power of the human spirit.


Share This