There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution condemning the downing of Malaysia Airlines Flight 17 and expressing condolences to the families of the victims.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/31/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 8/1/2014 S5314-5315)
07/29/2014Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/24/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
07/31/2014Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 8/1/2014 S5314-5315)
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3779 Amendment SA 3779 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3779 Amendment SA 3779 proposed by Senator Pryor for Senator Murphy. To make a technical correction.
07/31/2014Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5314-5315)
07/29/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 497.
07/29/2014Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/29/2014Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/24/2014Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4909)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 07/24/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 07/28/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/29/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations07/24/2014 Referred to
07/29/2014 Markup by
07/29/2014 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.Res.520.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.520. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/31/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Condemns the shooting down of Malaysian Airlines Flight 17 in Eastern Ukraine that resulted in the deaths of all 298 passengers and crew.

Expresses condolences to the families of the victims and the people of the Netherlands, Malaysia, Australia, Indonesia, Great Britain, Germany, Belgium, the Philippines, Canada, and New Zealand.

Supports the international investigation into the attack on Malaysian Airlines Flight 17, including unobstructed access to the crash site.

Calls on the Russian Federation to stop the flow of weapons and fighters across the border with Ukraine, allow an Organization for Security and Co-operation in Europe monitoring mission on the border, and fully cooperate with the international investigation.

Urges the European Union (EU) to join the United State in holding the Russian Federation accountable for its actions in Ukraine through the use of increased sanctions.