There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate supporting the U.S.-Africa Leaders Summit to be held in Washington, D.C., from August 4 through 6, 2014.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/31/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5315)
07/29/2014Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/24/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
07/31/2014Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5315)
07/29/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 498.
07/29/2014Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/29/2014Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/24/2014Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4910)

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 07/24/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/24/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 07/24/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 07/29/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/29/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/31/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations07/24/2014 Referred to
07/29/2014 Markup by
07/29/2014 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.Res.522.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.522. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/31/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Values the historic U.S. commitment to Africa, and affirms the partnership of the people and government of the United States with the African people.

Affirms a future commitment to increased economic partnership with Africa.

Supports African-led efforts to improve peacekeeping, prevent atrocities, and combat violent extremism and terrorism.

Encourages African leaders to strengthen good governance, the rule of law, and democracy.

Supports efforts to protect and promote women and children, including through investments in education and maternal, newborn, and child health.

Reaffirms the U.S. investment in health care in Africa.

Commends and supports African investments in preventing wildlife trafficking.

Supports the U.S.-Africa Leaders Summit to be held in the United States from August 4 through August 6, 2014.