Text: S.Res.522 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (07/31/2014)


113th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. RES. 522


Expressing the sense of the Senate supporting the U.S.-Africa Leaders Summit to be held in Washington, D.C., from August 4 through 6, 2014.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

July 24, 2014

Mr. Coons (for himself, Mr. Flake, Mr. Menendez, Mr. Corker, Mr. Durbin, Mrs. Shaheen, and Ms. Klobuchar) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations

July 29, 2014

Reported by Mr. Menendez, without amendment

July 31, 2014

Considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Expressing the sense of the Senate supporting the U.S.-Africa Leaders Summit to be held in Washington, D.C., from August 4 through 6, 2014.

    Whereas the United States will convene the first U.S.-Africa Leaders Summit from August 4 through August 6, 2014, featuring a congressional reception welcoming African heads of state, the U.S.-Africa Business Forum, the African Growth and Opportunity Act (AGOA) Forum, and dialogue sessions between African leaders and President Barack Obama on investing in Africa’s future, promoting peace and regional stability, and governing for the next generation;

    Whereas the U.S.-Africa Leaders Summit will be the largest event held between the United States Government and African heads of state and governments;

    Whereas the U.S.-Africa Leaders Summit will build on the President’s trip to Africa in the summer of 2013 and will strengthen ties between the United States and one of the most dynamic and fastest growing regions in the world;

    Whereas the United States Government has built strong and enduring partnerships with African heads of state bilaterally and through the United Nations, African Union, and African regional institutions;

    Whereas the United States Government has demonstrated its commitment to Africa’s development and growth through resources, legislation, economic relationships, and initiatives, including the African Growth and Opportunity Act (19 U.S.C. 3701 et seq.), Power Africa, Feed the Future, Millennium Challenge Corporation compacts, and other efforts led by the Department of State, the United States Agency for International Development, the Overseas Private Investment Corporation, the Department of Commerce, and other agencies of the United States Government;

    Whereas there are 10 authorized United Nations peacekeeping operations in Africa with over 94,000 United Nations peacekeepers working to promote peace and stability for over 131,000,000 people across the continent, in addition to additional missions led by the African Union, with United States and international support and training;

    Whereas the United States has served as the global leader in investments and innovations in health across Africa, contributing significant resources to improvements in health over the past two decades through United States-led programs such as the President’s Emergency Plan for AIDS Relief (PEPFAR), the President’s Malaria Initiative (PMI), and the Global Alliance for Vaccines and Immunization (GAVI);

    Whereas, through its investments in health across 16 priority countries in Africa over the last two decades, the United States Government has contributed to the reduction of child mortality rates by 44 percent and the reduction of maternal mortality rates by 39 percent;

    Whereas the majority of the fastest growing economies in the world are in Africa, and the continent’s steady annual economic growth rate of 5 percent has exceeded that of other regions in the world;

    Whereas there are currently 1,000,000,000 Africans representing the fastest growing population in the world, and by 2035, the African continent will have the world’s largest workforce;

    Whereas individual nations in Africa and the African Union have made significant achievements and remarkable progress since the inception of the African Union 51 years ago and its transition from the Organization of African Unity;

    Whereas the United States Government, recognizing the importance of Africa’s youth and future generations, has invested in the next generation of African entrepreneurs, educators, civic leaders, and innovators, including through the United States-led Young African Leaders Initiative (YALI), helping them develop skills and networks to build brighter futures for their communities and countries; and

    Whereas the United States Government is looking forward to hosting 50 heads of state and the Chair of the African Union at the U.S.-Africa Leaders Summit to demonstrate the United States commitment to Africa, deepen partnerships, and determine concrete ways that the United States can support African-led efforts to further peace and regional security, advance democracy and good governance, improve health and education services, increase trade and investment, address environmental issues, improve resilience and food security, combat wildlife trafficking, invest in women, and support the next generation of African leaders: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the Senate—

(1) deeply values the historic United States commitment to Africa;

(2) affirms a future commitment to increased economic partnership with Africa;

(3) supports innovations in development and an expanded partnership with the private sector, including in the areas of energy, food security, and health;

(4) supports efforts to facilitate increased trade and investment between the United States and Africa, as well as amongst African countries;

(5) supports ongoing African-led efforts to improve peacekeeping, prevent atrocities, and combat violent extremism and terrorism;

(6) affirms the enduring partnership of the people and Government of the United States with the African people, including the youth, and urges African leaders to invest in this generation of young people, as well as the next generation;

(7) encourages leaders in Africa to make efforts toward strengthening good governance, the rule of law, and democracy, including respecting constitutional term limits, human rights, and ensuring that civil society organizations are able to function freely in their countries;

(8) supports ongoing efforts to protect and promote women and children, including through investments in education and maternal, newborn, and child health;

(9) reaffirms the strong United States investment in health in Africa, and anticipates leaders in Africa making greater and sustainable investments in healthcare;

(10) commends African investments in preventing wildlife trafficking and supports further investments, including training and equipping enforcement teams in Africa;

(11) urges African heads of state to take concrete steps to implement reforms that will further economic growth, good governance, democracy, peace, security, rule of law, and development; and

(12) expresses support for the U.S.-Africa Leaders Summit from August 4 through August 6, 2014.


Share This