Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/05/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/06/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/19/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/19/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/18/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/18/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/18/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/18/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/17/2013