Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/05/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/05/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/05/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/05/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/05/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/05/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/05/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/05/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/05/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/06/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/11/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/11/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/11/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/11/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/12/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/13/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/13/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/14/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/18/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/19/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/19/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/09/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 04/09/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/16/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 04/17/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/17/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/18/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/23/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/24/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/24/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/13/2013