Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/13/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/13/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/13/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/18/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/18/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/08/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/08/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/08/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/08/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/18/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/18/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/15/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/20/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/20/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/21/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/03/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/03/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/03/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/06/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/11/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/19/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/27/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/18/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 07/23/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/10/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/02/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/07/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/28/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/07/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/17/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/17/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/17/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 12/20/2013