Text: S.Res.92 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred to Committee Senate (04/08/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 92

Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on the Judiciary.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
April 5, 2013

Mr. Leahy, from the Committee on the Judiciary, reported under the authority of the order of the Senate of March 23 (legislative day, March 22), 2013, the following original resolution; which was placed on the calendar

April 8, 2013

Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration


RESOLUTION

Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on the Judiciary.

Resolved,

SECTION 1. General authority.

In carrying out its powers, duties, and functions under the Standing Rules of the Senate, in accordance with its jurisdiction under rule XXV of the Standing Rules of the Senate, including holding hearings, reporting such hearings, and making investigations as authorized by paragraphs 1 and 8 of rule XXVI of the Standing Rules of the Senate, the Committee on the Judiciary (in this resolution referred to as the “committee”) is authorized from March 1, 2013 through September 30, 2013; October 1, 2013 through September 30, 2014; and October 1, 2014 through February 28, 2015, in its discretion to—

(1) make expenditures from the contingent fund of the Senate;

(2) employ personnel; and

(3) with the prior consent of the Government department or agency concerned and the Committee on Rules and Administration, to use on a reimbursable or nonreimbursable basis the services of personnel of any such department or agency.

SEC. 2. Expense limitations.

(a) Expenses for the period March 1, 2013 through September 30, 2013.—The expenses of the committee for the period March 1, 2013 through September 30, 2013 under this resolution shall not exceed $5,882,131, of which amount—

(1) not to exceed $200,000 may be expended for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 72a(i))); and

(2) not to exceed $20,000 may be expended for the training of the professional staff of the committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) of that Act).

(b) Expenses for the period October 1, 2013 through September 30, 2014.—The expenses of the committee for the period October 1, 2013 through September 30, 2014 under this resolution shall not exceed $10,083,653, of which amount—

(1) not to exceed $200,000 may be expended for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 72a(i))); and

(2) not to exceed $20,000 may be expended for the training of the professional staff of the committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) of that Act).

(c) Expenses for the period October 1, 2014 through February 28, 2015.—The expenses of the committee for the period October 1, 2014 through February 28, 2015 under this resolution shall not exceed $4,201,522, of which amount—

(1) not to exceed $200,000 may be expended for the procurement of the services of individual consultants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by section 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 (2 U.S.C. 72a(i))); and

(2) not to exceed $20,000 may be expended for the training of the professional staff of the committee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) of that Act).

SEC. 3. Reporting legislation.

The committee shall report its findings, together with such recommendations for legislation as it deems advisable, to the Senate at the earliest practicable date, but not later than February 28, 2015.

SEC. 4. Expenses and agency contributions.

(a) Expenses of the committee.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Except as provided in paragraph (2), expenses of the committee under this resolution shall be paid from the contingent fund of the Senate upon vouchers approved by the chairman of the committee.

(2) VOUCHERS NOT REQUIRED.—Vouchers shall not be required for—

(A) the disbursement of salaries of employees paid at an annual rate;

(B) the payment of telecommunications provided by the Office of the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper;

(C) the payment of stationery supplies purchased through the Keeper of the Stationery;

(D) payments to the Postmaster of the Senate;

(E) the payment of metered charges on copying equipment provided by the Office of the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper;

(F) the payment of Senate Recording and Photographic Services; or

(G) the payment of franked and mass mail costs by the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper, United States Senate.

(b) Agency contributions.—There are authorized such sums as may be necessary for agency contributions related to the compensation of employees of the committee from March 1, 2013 through September 30, 2013; October 1, 2013 through September 30, 2014; and October 1, 2014 through February 28, 2015, to be paid from the appropriations account for “Expenses of Inquiries and Investigations” of the Senate.