There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Regulate Marijuana Like Alcohol Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To decriminalize marijuana at the Federal level, to leave to the States a power to regulate marijuana that is similar to the power they have to regulate alcohol, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/20/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
03/27/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/09/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/27/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/20/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/20/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/20/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/20/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/20/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/20/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/20/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/20/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/16/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/20/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/27/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/20/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade03/27/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/20/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/16/2015 Referred to
House Agriculture02/20/2015 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry03/09/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1013. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/20/2015)

Regulate Marijuana Like Alcohol Act

Directs the Attorney General to issue a final order that removes marijuana in any form from all schedules of controlled substances under the Controlled Substances Act.

Amends such Act to: (1) provide that schedules I, II, III, IV, and V shall consist of the drugs and other substances that are set forth in the respective schedules in part 1308 of title 21 of the Code of Federal Regulations; (2) exempt marijuana from such Act except as provided in this Act; (3) revise the definition of "felony drug offense" to exclude conduct relating to marijuana; and (4) eliminate marijuana from provisions setting forth penalties applicable to prohibited conduct under such Act.

Prohibits shipping or transporting marijuana from any place outside a jurisdiction of the United States into such a jurisdiction in which its possession, use, or sale is prohibited.

Eliminates marijuana as: (1) a controlled substance for purposes of the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act or the National Forest System Drug Control Act of 1986, (2) a dangerous drug for purposes of federal criminal code provisions authorizing interception of communications, and (3) a targeted drug for purposes of provisions of the national youth anti-drug media campaign under the Office of National Drug Control Policy Reauthorization Act of 1998.

Amends the Federal Alcohol Administration Act to set forth procedures for the issuance and revocation by the Secretary of the Treasury of permits for importing, shipping or selling in interstate or foreign commerce, purchasing for resale, producing, packaging, or warehousing marijuana. Prohibits any person from engaging in such conduct without a permit, subject to a $1,000 fine and/or a $500 payment. Sets forth criteria for ineligible applicants and disqualifying offenses.

Subjects marijuana to the provisions that apply to: (1) intoxicating liquors under the Original Packages Act, the Webb-Kenyon Act, and the Victims of Trafficking and Violence Protection Act of 2000; and (2) distilled spirits under the Federal Alcohol Administration Act.

Grants the Food and Drug Administration the same authorities with respect to marijuana as it has for alcohol. Transfers functions of the Administrator of the Drug Enforcement Administration relating to marijuana enforcement to the Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives (ATF). Renames: (1) ATF as the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Marijuana, Firearms and Explosives; and (2) the Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau as the Alcohol, Tobacco, and Marijuana Tax and Trade Bureau.

Directs the Comptroller General to review federal laws, regulations, and policies to determine if changes are desirable in light of this Act.