There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Taxpayer Knowledge of IRS Investigations Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Taxpayer Knowledge of IRS Investigations Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Taxpayer Knowledge of IRS Investigations Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permit the release of information regarding the status of certain investigations.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/15/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2233)
04/13/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-68.
02/24/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/16/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
04/15/2015-2:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/15/2015-2:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2233)
04/15/2015-2:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1026.
04/15/2015-2:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2233-2235)
04/15/2015-2:07pmHouseMr. Ryan (WI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/13/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48.
04/13/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-68.
03/25/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/25/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/24/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
02/24/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 02/24/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/25/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/24/2015 Referred to
03/25/2015 Markup by
04/13/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-68
Senate Finance04/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1026. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/15/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 13, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Taxpayer Knowledge of IRS Investigations Act

(Sec. 2) Amends the Internal Revenue Code to authorize the Department of the Treasury to disclose to any person who provides information indicating a violation of internal revenue laws relating to unauthorized disclosure or inspection of tax information or to unlawful acts of revenue officers or agents: (1) whether an investigation based on such information has been initiated and is open or closed; (2) whether any such investigation substantiated a violation; and (3) whether any action has been taken against a violator, including a referral for prosecution.

Makes this Act applicable to disclosures made on or after its enactment date.