There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1030. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/18/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on March 2, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Secret Science Reform Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Environmental Research, Development, and Demonstration Authorization Act of 1978 to prohibit the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) from proposing, finalizing, or disseminating a covered action unless all scientific and technical information relied on to support such action is the best available science, specifically identified, and publicly available in a manner sufficient for independent analysis and substantial reproduction of research results. A covered action includes a risk, exposure, or hazard assessment, criteria document, standard, limitation, regulation, regulatory impact analysis, or guidance. Scientific and technical information includes: (1) materials, data, and associated protocols necessary to understand, assess, and extend conclusions; (2) computer codes and models involved in the creation and analysis of the information; (3) recorded factual materials; and (4) detailed descriptions of how to access and use the information.

This Act may not be construed as requiring the EPA to disseminate scientific and technical information, or superseding any nondiscretionary statutory requirement.

The EPA may not spend more than $1 million per fiscal year on carrying out this Act.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/18/2015 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 241 - 175 (Roll no. 125).(text: CR H1742)
03/02/2015 Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 114-34.
02/24/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber
03/19/2015 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
03/18/2015-2:40pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/18/2015-2:40pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 241 - 175 (Roll no. 125). (text: CR H1742)
03/18/2015-2:33pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 181 - 239 (Roll no. 124).
03/18/2015-2:26pm House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H1747)
03/18/2015-2:17pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Takai motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a new section at the end of the bill pertaining to protecting taxpayers from science promoted by polluting companies, pending a reservation of a point of order. Subsequently, the reservation was removed.
03/18/2015-2:16pm House Mr. Takai moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. (consideration: CR H1746-1748; text: CR H1746)
03/18/2015-2:15pm House The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
03/18/2015-2:14pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H1746)
03/18/2015-2:14pm House The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1030.
03/18/2015-2:14pm House H.Amdt.79 On agreeing to the Kennedy amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 184 - 231 (Roll no. 123).
03/18/2015-2:09pm House H.Amdt.78 On agreeing to the Edwards amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 164 - 254 (Roll no. 122).
03/18/2015-1:41pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Kennedy amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Kennedy demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
03/18/2015-1:33pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 138, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Kennedy Part B amendment No. 2.
03/18/2015-1:32pm House H.Amdt.79 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Kennedy. (consideration: CR H1743-1744, H1745-1746; text: CR H1743)
03/18/2015-1:32pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Edwards amendment No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Edwards demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
03/18/2015-1:22pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 138, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Edwards Part B amendment No. 1.
03/18/2015-1:21pm House H.Amdt.78 Amendment (A001) offered by Ms. Edwards. (consideration: CR H1742-1743, H1744-1745; text: CR H1742)
03/18/2015-12:33pm House GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1030.
03/18/2015-12:33pm House The Speaker designated the Honorable Garret Graves to act as Chairman of the Committee.
03/18/2015-12:32pm House House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 138 and Rule XVIII.
03/18/2015-12:32pm House For each measure, resolution provides one hour of general debate; makes specified amendments in order; and allows a motion to recommit, with or without instructions.
03/18/2015-12:32pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 138. (consideration: CR H1733-1748)
03/17/2015-1:56pm House Rule H. Res. 138 passed House.
03/03/2015-5:01pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 138 Reported to House. For each measure, resolution provides one hour of general debate; makes specified amendments in order; and allows a motion to recommit, with or without instructions.
03/02/2015 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 23.
03/02/2015 House Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 114-34.
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology
02/25/2015 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 11.
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology
02/25/2015 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology
02/24/2015 House Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
02/24/2015 House Introduced in House

Titles (4)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

Secret Science Reform Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House:

Secret Science Reform Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced:

Secret Science Reform Act of 2015

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To prohibit the Environmental Protection Agency from proposing, finalizing, or disseminating regulations or assessments based upon science that is not transparent or reproducible.


Subjects (7)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
  • Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
  • Environmental regulatory procedures
  • Government information and archives
  • Research administration and funding

Cosponsors (28)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology02/24/2015 Referred to
02/25/2015 Markup by
03/02/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-34
Senate Environment and Public Works03/19/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.