There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Comprehensive Dental Reform Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve access to oral health care for vulnerable and underserved populations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date All Actions
11/23/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/27/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/23/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/25/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/25/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/27/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary02/25/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/16/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/25/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs03/23/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs02/25/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/06/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services02/25/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel11/23/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1055. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2015)

Comprehensive Dental Reform Act of 2015

Amends titles XVIII (Medicare) and XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to cover oral health services.

Increases the federal medical assistance percentage for oral health services, thereby increasing payments to states under Medicaid.

Directs the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to maintain a database of dental benefits available to adult Medicaid enrollees in each state.

Amends the Public Health Service Act to establish, revise, and extend funding for grant programs for:

  • educating nondental professionals about oral health care;
  • providing dental services in hospital emergency rooms or in community settings;
  • providing scholarships and education loans for oral health professional students;
  • providing oral health services to low-income and underserved individuals;
  • building, operating, or expanding dental clinics in schools; and
  • providing mobile, comprehensive dental services at locations that serve individuals who qualify for benefits under specified programs.

Authorizes community based dental residencies.

Authorizes specified agencies to conduct research on oral health issues through FY2019.

Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to make oral health services an essential health benefit.

Removes restrictions on the authority of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide dental care to veterans (thereby requiring dental care on the same basis as other VA-provided medical care and services).

Authorizes the VA, Department of Defense, Bureau of Prisons, and Indian Health Service to carry out demonstration programs to train and employ alternative dental health care providers in order to increase access to dental services.

Directs the Department of Health and Human Services to conduct a cost-benefit analysis of the expansion of dental service coverage pursuant to this Act.

Directs the Government Accountability Office to evaluate the implementation and utilization of expanded dental service coverage under this Act and the demonstration programs authorized by this Act.