There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Denying Firearms and Explosives to Dangerous Terrorists Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase public safety by permitting the Attorney General to deny the transfer of a firearm or the issuance of firearms or explosives licenses to a known or suspected dangerous terrorist.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/07/2015Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Thompson (CA). Petition No: 114-3. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/31/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/25/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (133)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/25/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/13/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/21/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/24/2015
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/18/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/19/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/19/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/19/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 11/19/2015
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/19/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/01/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/01/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/01/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/01/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/01/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/01/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/01/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/01/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/01/2015
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/01/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/01/2015
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 12/01/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/02/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/02/2015
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/02/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 12/02/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/03/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/03/2015
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 12/03/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/03/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/03/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/03/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/03/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/03/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/03/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/08/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/08/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 12/08/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/08/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/08/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/08/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/08/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/08/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/08/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/08/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/08/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 12/08/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/08/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/08/2015
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 12/08/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/08/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/08/2015
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 12/08/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 12/08/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/08/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 12/08/2015
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 12/08/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/08/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/08/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/08/2015
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 12/08/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 12/08/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/08/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/08/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 12/08/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 12/09/2015
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/09/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 12/09/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/09/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/09/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/09/2015
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/09/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/09/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/11/2015
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/15/2015
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/15/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/15/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/06/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/12/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/13/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/01/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/01/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/13/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/14/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/14/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/14/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/14/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/14/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/14/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/14/2016
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 06/15/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/15/2016
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/15/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/15/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/16/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 06/16/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/16/2016
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/21/2016
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/21/2016
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/21/2016
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/21/2016
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/22/2016
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/22/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/22/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/22/2016
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/22/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/22/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/28/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/28/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/05/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/07/2016
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/07/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/11/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/12/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/25/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/31/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1076. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2015)

Denying Firearms and Explosives to Dangerous Terrorists Act of 2015

Amends the federal criminal code to grant the Attorney General the authority to deny the transfer of firearms or the issuance of a federal firearms and explosives license to any individual if the Attorney General: (1) determines that such individual has been engaged in or has provided material support or resources for terrorist activities, and (2) has a reasonable belief that such individual may use a firearm or explosive in connection with terrorism. Allows any individual whose firearm or explosives license application has been denied to bring legal action challenging the denial.

Prohibits the sale or distribution of firearms or explosives to any individual whom the Attorney General has determined to be engaged in terrorist activities.

Permits the Attorney General to withhold information in firearms and explosives license denial revocation suits if the Attorney General determines that the disclosure of such information would likely compromise national security.

Authorizes the Attorney General to revoke firearms and explosives licenses and permits held by individuals determined to be engaged in terrorism.