There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Native American Indian Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To help fulfill the Federal mandate to provide higher educational opportunities for Native American Indians.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
04/29/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/25/2015
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/25/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/04/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/23/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/23/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/23/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/26/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/14/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/14/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/14/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/21/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/21/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/21/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/29/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/30/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/18/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/19/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/19/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/19/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/21/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/21/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/01/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/01/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/01/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/03/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/10/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/24/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/08/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/30/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/28/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/06/2016
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/12/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/12/2016
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/01/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/01/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/09/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 02/11/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/07/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/11/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/06/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/06/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/21/2016
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/21/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/08/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/25/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training04/29/2015 Referred to
House Appropriations02/25/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1089. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2015)

Native American Indian Education Act

Directs the Department of Education to pay four-year Native American-serving nontribal institutions of higher education the out-of-state tuition of their Indian students if those schools are required to provide a tuition-free education, with the support of their state, to Indian students in fulfillment of a condition under which the college or state received its original grant of land and facilities from the federal government.

Prohibits the amount paid to any such college from exceeding the lower of the following amounts: (1) the charges for tuition for the Indian students of that college who were non-residents of the state in which the college is located and who were enrolled in the college for academic year 2014-2015, or (2) $15 million.

Treats such payments as reimbursements to such institutions from their states.

Rescinds unobligated discretionary appropriations to offset the costs of this program.