There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Peacebuilding Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a Department of Peacebuilding.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/26/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/26/2015Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/27/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/23/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/23/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/13/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/13/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/13/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/13/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/13/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/15/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/15/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/15/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/15/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/21/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/28/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/28/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/02/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/08/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/20/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/16/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/09/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/29/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/21/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 03/23/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/23/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/11/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/11/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/14/2016
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/10/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/27/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/05/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/28/2016
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/07/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/26/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1111.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1111. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2015)

Department of Peacebuilding Act of 2015

Establishes a Department of Peacebuilding in the executive branch, to be headed by a Secretary of Peacebuilding, dedicated to peacebuilding, peacemaking, and the study and promotion of conditions conducive to both domestic and international peace and a culture of peace.

Sets forth the mission of the Department, which includes the: (1) cultivation of peace and peacebuilding as a strategic national policy objective; and (2) development of policies that promote national and international conflict prevention, nonviolent intervention, mediation, peaceful conflict resolution, and structured conflict mediation.

Establishes in the Department: (1) the Office of Peace Education and Training, (2) the Office of Domestic Peacebuilding Activities, (3) the Office of International Peacebuilding Activities, (4) the Office of Technology for Peace, (5) the Office of Arms Control and Disarmament, (6) the Office of Peacebuilding Information and Research, (7) the Office of Human Rights and Economic Rights, and (8) the Intergovernmental Advisory Council on Peace.

Establishes a Federal Interagency Committee on Peace to coordinate the actions of the Department with other federal agencies.

Directs the Secretary of Defense and the Secretary of State to consult with the Secretary concerning nonviolent means of conflict resolution when a conflict between the United States and any other government or entity is imminent or occurring.

Directs the Secretary to encourage citizens to observe and celebrate the blessings of peace and endeavor to create peace on Peace Days, which shall include discussions of the professional activities and the achievements in the lives of peacemakers.