There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reciprocal Access to Tibet Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote access for United States officials, journalists, and other citizens to Tibetan areas of the People's Republic of China, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/26/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/31/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/20/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/26/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/26/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/13/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/13/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/13/2015
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/15/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/15/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/15/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/15/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/15/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2015
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/15/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/15/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/15/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/15/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/15/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/15/2015
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/15/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/15/2015
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/15/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/15/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/15/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/18/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/22/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/08/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/08/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/08/2015
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/31/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/04/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/01/2016
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/14/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/14/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/29/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/10/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/10/2016
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/05/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/06/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/26/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/31/2015 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/26/2015 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific03/20/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1112.


Subjects (12)

  • Asia
  • China
  • Congressional oversight
  • Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Immigration status and procedures
  • News media and reporting
  • Sanctions
  • Tibet
  • Travel and tourism
  • Visas and passports

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1112. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2015)

Reciprocal Access to Tibet Act of 2015

Directs the Secretary of State to submit an annual, publicly-available report to Congress containing: (1) an assessment of the level of access Chinese authorities granted U.S. diplomats, journalists, and tourists to Tibetan areas in China; (2) a list of the persons in senior leadership positions in Tibet Autonomous Region and other specified provinces, prefectures, and autonomous entities; and (3) a list of the persons in senior leadership positions at the national and regional levels as defined by this Act.

Makes certain listed persons ineligible for U.S entry under specified circumstances.

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) reciprocity forms the basis of diplomatic law and the practice of mutual exchanges between countries; (2) consular access should be given on a reciprocal basis; and (3) the Secretary, when granting Chinese diplomats access to parts of the United States, should take into account the extent to which China grants U.S. diplomats access to parts of China, including the level of access to Tibetan areas.