There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Legal Workforce Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to make mandatory and permanent requirements relating to use of an electronic employment eligibility verification system, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
03/27/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/03/2015Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 13.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/03/2015Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security Discharged.
03/03/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/02/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/27/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/02/2015
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/02/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 03/02/2015
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/02/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/04/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/04/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/04/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/04/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/04/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/04/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/04/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/04/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/04/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 03/10/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 03/10/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/10/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/19/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 03/19/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/23/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/23/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/23/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/14/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/21/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/22/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/22/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/28/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 07/14/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 08/04/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/04/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 01/07/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/11/2016
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/08/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/29/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/05/2016
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/28/2016
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 12/01/2016

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/27/2015 Referred to
03/03/2015 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/02/2015 Referred to
03/03/2015 Discharged from
House Ways and Means02/27/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security03/27/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce02/27/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1147. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/2015)

Legal Workforce Act

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to direct the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish an employment eligibility verification system (EEVS), patterned after the E-Verify system. (Eliminates the current paper-based I-9 system.)

Requires an employer to attest, during the verification period and under penalty of perjury, that the employer has verified that an individual is not an unauthorized alien by: (1) obtaining and recording the individual's social security account number, and (2) examining specified documents that establish such individual's identity and employment authorization.

Requires an individual to attest that he or she is a U.S. citizen or national, a lawful permanent resident, or an alien authorized to work in the United States.

Establishes a phased-in EEVS participation deadline (six months to two years) for different categories of employers, including agricultural employers.

Requires reverification of the following workers who have not been verified under E-verify: (1) federal, state, or local government employees; (2) certain employees who require a federal security clearance; and (3) certain employees assigned to work in the United States under a federal or state contract.

Authorizes an employer to voluntarily reverify employees. (Requires any such reverification to be applied to all individuals so employed).

Includes employment recruitment and referral within the scope of EEVS. Requires EEVS use by union halls and nonprofit employment agencies.

Requires EEVS to provide employers with: (1) temporary verification or nonverification within 3 working days of an inquiry; and (2) in the case of nonverification, a final verification or nonverification within 10 working days.

Sets forth provisions regarding: (1) an employer utilizing a good faith defense, (2) preemption of state or local law, (3) employer penalties, and (4) worker remedies for EEVS errors.

Provides for the establishment of programs to: (1) block the use of misused social security numbers, and (2) suspend or limit the use of Social Security numbers of victims of identity fraud.

Requires an employer who uses the photo matching tool as part of the E-Verify system to match the photo tool photograph to both the photograph on the identity or employment eligibility document provided by the employee and to the face of the employee submitting the document.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) establish a program under which parents or legal guardians may suspend or limit the use of the social security account number or other identifying information of a minor for the purposes of the employment eligibility verification system, and (2) establish an Identity Authentication Employment Eligibility Verification pilot program to provide employers with identity authentication and employment verification of enrolled new employees.