There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protection of Children Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to provide for the expedited removal of unaccompanied alien children who are not victims of a severe form of trafficking in persons and who do not have a fear of returning to their country of nationality or last habitual residence, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
03/04/2015Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 13.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/04/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/03/2015Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security Discharged.
03/02/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/02/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/03/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/13/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/13/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/13/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/13/2015
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/13/2015
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/13/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/13/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/13/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 03/13/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/13/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 03/13/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/13/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/13/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 03/13/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/18/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/18/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/19/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/23/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/23/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/13/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 04/28/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 07/13/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 08/04/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 10/08/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/18/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/14/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/27/2015 Referred to
03/04/2015 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/02/2015 Referred to
03/03/2015 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs02/27/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1149. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/2015)

Protection of Children Act of 2015

This bill amends the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to eliminate the special repatriation requirements for unaccompanied alien children (UAC) who are nationals or residents of a country contiguous to the United States. (The same removal requirements are applied to all UACs who are not victims of a severe form of trafficking in persons and who do not have a fear of returning to their country of nationality or last habitual residence.)

An immigration officer who finds an inadmissible UAC at a land border or port of entry shall return the child to his or her country of nationality or of last habitual residence. (Such authority is now only discretionary.)

The Department of State is authorized to negotiate agreements between the United States and other countries for the repatriation of children. (Under current law the State Department is required to negotiate agreements between the United States and countries contiguous to the United States for the repatriation of children.)

An unaccompanied child who is not a victim of a severe form of trafficking in persons, and does not have a fear of returning to his or her country of nationality or last habitual residence, but who is:

  • in removal proceedings shall have a hearing before an immigration judge within 14 days,
  • in federal custody shall be transferred to Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) custody within 30 days, and
  • in HHS or Department of Homeland Security (DHS) custody shall have access to legal counsel at no cost to the government.

HHS, before placing a child with an individual, shall provide DHS with the individual's name, Social Security number, date of birth, residence location, and immigration status, if known.

DHS shall investigate the immigration status of the individual with whom the child is placed, and initiate removal proceedings if that individual is unlawfully present in the United States.

Such requirements are applied to any unauthorized child apprehended on or after June 15, 2012.

The Immigration and Nationality Act is amended with respect to: (1) special immigrant juvenile status, and (2) jurisdiction of asylum applications.