There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

USPSTF Transparency and Accountability Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title IX of the Public Health Service Act to revise the operations of the United States Preventive Services Task Force, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/27/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/27/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/27/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/17/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/25/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/15/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/16/2015
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/16/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/22/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/12/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/12/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/12/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/15/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/21/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/21/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/21/2015
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 06/09/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/09/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/09/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/09/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/09/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/09/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/09/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/10/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/17/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/18/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 06/25/2015
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/07/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/07/2015
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/10/2015
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 07/13/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/14/2015
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/15/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/21/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/21/2015
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/21/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/27/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/09/2015
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 09/17/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/09/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/20/2015
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/01/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 03/01/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/03/2016
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/07/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/22/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/14/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/18/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/23/2016
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/23/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/23/2016
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/23/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/23/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/23/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/23/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/27/2016
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/03/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/03/2016
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/07/2016
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/08/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/08/2016
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/01/2016
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/07/2016
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 07/11/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/14/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/06/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/06/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/14/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/20/2016
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/21/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 09/26/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 09/27/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/16/2016
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 12/02/2016
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/09/2015 10/23/2015 --

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/27/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/06/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/27/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/27/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1151. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/2015)

USPSTF Transparency and Accountability Act of 2015

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to expand the scope and responsibilities of the United States Preventive Services Task Force to require it to: (1) publish research plans to guide its review of scientific evidence relating to the effectiveness of preventive services; (2) make evidence reports and recommendations available for public comment; (3) establish a system for grading preventive care (Grades A, B, C, and D and a Grade I for insufficient information); and (4) convene a preventive services stakeholders board to provide feedback on Task Force activities and recommend preventive services and scientific evidence for the Task Force to review. Members of the Task Force and the preventive services stakeholders board are considered federal employees for purposes of disclosure and management of conflicts of interest.

The Government Accountability Office must submit a report that: (1) lists current recommendations of the Task Force; (2) compares Task Force recommendations and recommendations of other federal health agencies, national medical professional societies, and patient and disease advocacy organizations; and (3) analyzes the impact of Task Force recommendations on public and private insurance coverage, access, and outcomes, including the impact on morbidity and mortality.

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to eliminate the authority of HHS to make no payment for a preventive service that has not been graded by the Task Force.