There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

IRS Email Transparency Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

IRS Email Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit officers and employees of the Internal Revenue Service from using personal email accounts to conduct official business.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/15/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2232)
04/13/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-69.
02/27/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
04/16/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
04/15/2015-2:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/15/2015-2:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2232)
04/15/2015-1:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1152.
04/15/2015-1:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2232-2233)
04/15/2015-1:57pmHouseMr. Ryan (WI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/13/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 49.
04/13/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-69.
03/25/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/25/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/27/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
02/27/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/27/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/27/2015 Referred to
03/25/2015 Markup by
04/13/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-69
Senate Finance04/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1152. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/15/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 13, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

IRS Email Transparency Act

Prohibits any officer or employee of the Internal Revenue Service from using a personal email account to conduct official business.