There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

American Health Security Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for health care for every American and to control the cost and enhance the quality of the health care system.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/02/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date All Actions
08/13/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/29/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/29/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/30/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/02/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2015Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E286)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/18/2016

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/02/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/06/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/02/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/30/2015 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform03/02/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services03/02/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/13/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce03/02/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education04/29/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions04/29/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1200.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1200. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/2015)

American Health Security Act of 2015

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives concerning recognition of health care as a human right.

Establishes the State-Based American Health Security Program to provide every U.S. resident who is a U.S. citizen, national, or lawful resident alien with health care services. Requires each participating state to establish a state health security program.

Eliminates benefits under: (1) titles XVIII (Medicare), XIX (Medicaid), and XXI (Children's Health Insurance) (CHIP) of the Social Security Act; (2) the Federal Employees Health Benefits Program; and (3) TRICARE.

Repeals requirements of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) related to health insurance coverage, including requirements concerning state health insurance exchanges.

Requires each state health security program to prohibit the sale of health insurance in that state that duplicates benefits provided under the program.

Establishes the American Health Security Standards Board to: (1) develop policies, procedures, guidelines and requirements to carry out this Act; (2) establish uniform reporting requirements and quality performance standards; (3) provide for an American Health Security Advisory Council and an Advisory Committee on Health Professional Education; and (4) establish a national health security budget specifying the total federal and state expenditures to be made for covered health care services.

Establishes the American Health Security Quality Council to: (1) review and evaluate practice guidelines, standards of quality, performance measures, and medical review criteria; and (2) develop minimum competence criteria.

Establishes the Office of Primary Care and Prevention Research within the Office of the Director of the National Institutes of Health.

Creates the American Health Security Trust Fund and appropriates to it specified tax liabilities and current health program receipts, including premium assistance credit amounts under PPACA.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose on individuals: (1) a health care income tax, and (2) an income tax surcharge on amounts of modified adjusted gross income exceeding $1 million. Imposes an excise tax on securities transactions and allows an income tax credit for such taxes.