There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mental Health in Schools Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to revise and extend projects relating to children and violence to provide access to school-based comprehensive mental health programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/03/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/03/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/03/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/14/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/14/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/16/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/21/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/21/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/21/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/22/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/22/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/28/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/28/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/28/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/28/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/13/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/13/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/15/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/20/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2015
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/21/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/03/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/08/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/09/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/09/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/16/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/17/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/07/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/07/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/14/2015
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/15/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/22/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/22/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/22/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/22/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/22/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/23/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/27/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/27/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/29/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/29/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/08/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/08/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/08/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/17/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/17/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/21/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/21/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/04/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/18/2015
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 01/07/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/13/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/13/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/20/2016
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/10/2016
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/13/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/21/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/14/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/06/2016
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/06/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/06/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/29/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce03/03/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/06/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1211. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/03/2015)

Mental Health in Schools Act of 2015

Amends the Public Health Service Act to revise a community children and violence program to assist local communities and schools in applying a public health approach to mental health services, including by: (1) revising eligibility requirements for a grant, contract, or cooperative agreement; and (2) providing for comprehensive school mental health programs that are culturally and linguistically appropriate, trauma-informed, and age appropriate. Requires a comprehensive school mental health program funded under this Act to assist children in dealing with trauma and violence. Makes only a partnership between a local educational agency and at least one community program or agency that is involved in mental health eligible for funding.

Requires the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration to develop a fiscally appropriate process for evaluating grant program activities, including the development of: (1) guidelines for the submission of program data by recipients; and (2) outcome measures to be applied by recipients in evaluating programs, including student and family measures and local educational measures.