There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Internet Freedom Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Federal Communications Commission from reclassifying broadband Internet access service as a telecommunications service and from imposing certain regulations on providers of such service.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/03/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/06/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/03/2015 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/03/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/03/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/04/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/04/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/04/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/04/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/04/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/04/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 03/04/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/04/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/04/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/04/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/04/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/13/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 03/13/2015
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/13/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 03/13/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/13/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/13/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/13/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 03/13/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/13/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/13/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/13/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/13/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/25/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/25/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 04/16/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 04/16/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/16/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/16/2015
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/28/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 07/13/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/13/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/03/2016
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/03/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/03/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology03/06/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Competition and antitrust
  • Consumer affairs
  • Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
  • Internet and video services
  • Telephone and wireless communication

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1212. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/03/2015)

Internet Freedom Act

Nullifies the rule adopted by the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) on February 26, 2015, relating to the reclassification of broadband Internet access service as a telecommunications service.

Prohibits the FCC from reissuing such rule in substantially the same form, or from issuing a new rule that is substantially the same, unless the rule is specifically authorized by a law enacted after enactment of this Act.

Exempts any rule that the FCC determines is necessary for national security, public safety, or assistance to law enforcement.