There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Forest Small Tracts Act Amendments Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Forest Small Tracts Act Amendments Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

National Forest Small Tracts Act Amendments Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Tracts Act to expand the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture to sell or exchange small parcels of National Forest System land to enhance the management of the National Forest System, to resolve minor encroachments, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
09/16/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 495).(text: CR H5995)
06/08/2015Committee on Agriculture discharged.
06/08/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-140, Part I.
03/03/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/17/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
09/16/2015-7:16pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 495). (text: CR H5995)
09/16/2015-7:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/16/2015-6:32pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6003-6004)
09/16/2015-3:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/16/2015-3:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1214.
09/16/2015-3:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5995-5996)
09/16/2015-3:40pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/08/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 100.
06/08/2015HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged.
06/08/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-140, Part I.
04/30/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/30/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/30/2015HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
04/29/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/23/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/03/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/03/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/03/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/03/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/24/2015
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/21/2015

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/03/2015 Referred to
04/30/2015 Markup by
06/08/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-140
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/23/2015 Referred to
04/30/2015 Discharged from
House Agriculture03/03/2015 Referred to
06/08/2015 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry03/16/2015 Referred to
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry09/17/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1214. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/16/2015)

National Forest Small Tracts Act Amendments Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Amends the Small Tracts Act (the Act) to permit the sale, exchange, or interchange under such Act of National Forest System (NFS) lands the sale or exchange of which is not practicable under any other authority of the Department of Agriculture (USDA) which have a value determined to be not more than $500,000.

Includes as those lands permitted to be sold, exchanged, or interchanged under the Act:

  • parcels of 40 acres or less which are determined to be physically isolated, to be inaccessible, or to have lost their National Forest character;
  • parcels of 10 acres or less which are not eligible for conveyance under such Act, but which are encroached upon by permanent habitable improvements for which there is no evidence that the encroachment was intentional or negligent; and
  • parcels used as a cemetery, a landfill, or a sewage treatment plant under a special use authorization issued by the USDA.

Allows the sale, exchange, or interchange of a cemetery that is expected to reach capacity within 10 years to include, in the USDA's sole discretion, up to 1 additional acre abutting the permit area to facilitate the expansion of that cemetery.

Requires any proceeds under this Act to be deposited in the special fund established under the Sisk Act and made available for:

  • the acquisition of land or interests in land for administrative sites for the NFS in the state from which the amounts were derived;
  • the acquisition of land or interests in land for inclusion in the NFS in that state, including those which enhance opportunities for recreational access;
  • the performance of deferred maintenance on administrative sites for the NFS in that state or other deferred maintenance activities in that state which enhance opportunities for recreational access; and
  • the reimbursement of the USDA for costs incurred in preparing a competitive sale conducted under the authority of the Act.