There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PHIT Act
Personal Health Investment Today Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to treat certain amounts paid for physical activity, fitness, and exercise as amounts paid for medical care.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/03/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/03/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/03/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/03/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/04/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/04/2015
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/16/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 03/16/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/16/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/16/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/16/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/16/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/19/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/19/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/19/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 03/19/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/26/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 03/26/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 04/13/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/13/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/15/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/16/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2015
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/15/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/21/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/02/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/04/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/04/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/16/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/24/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/07/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/07/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/31/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/10/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/10/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/17/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/17/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/17/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/28/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 10/07/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/02/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/02/2015
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 11/02/2015
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/18/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/18/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/09/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 12/09/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/09/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/11/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/04/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/04/2016
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 01/04/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/02/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/23/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/17/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/17/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/17/2016
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/17/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/17/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 04/12/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/12/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/12/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/12/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/12/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/12/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 04/14/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/14/2016
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/14/2016
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 04/20/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/20/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/20/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/20/2016
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/28/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/28/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/28/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/26/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/26/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/26/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/26/2016
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/26/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/26/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/08/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/14/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 07/14/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/13/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/22/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/03/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1218. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/03/2015)

Personal Health Investment Today Act or the PHIT Act

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a medical care tax deduction for up to $1,000 ($2,000 for a joint return or a head of household) of qualified sports and fitness expenses. Defines "qualified sports and fitness expenses" as amounts paid for fitness facility memberships, physical exercise programs, and exercise equipment.