There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Work for Warriors Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize a pilot program in the Department of Defense to enhance efforts to provide job placement assistance and related employment services directly to members of the National Guard and Reserves and veterans of the Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/03/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
08/13/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/13/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/03/2015Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/03/2015Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/03/2015Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/03/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/03/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/17/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/12/2015
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 02/04/2016
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/27/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services03/03/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/13/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs03/03/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity03/13/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1227. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/03/2015)

Work for Warriors Act of 2015

Authorizes the Department of Defense (DOD) to carry out a pilot program to enhance DOD's efforts to provide job placement assistance and related employment services to members of the National Guard and Reserves and veterans of the Armed Forces. Requires the program to follow a job placement program model that focuses on working one-on-one with a member of a reserve component to cost-effectively provide job placement services.

Requires DOD to: (1) develop outcome measurements to evaluate the success of the program, and (2) report to the congressional defense committees on program results.

Terminates the authority to carry out the program on September 30, 2018, with an authorized extension for up to two additional fiscal years.