There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Restoring Access to Medication and Improving Health Savings Act of 2016

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Health Care Security Act of 2016
  • Protecting Taxpayers by Recovering Improper Obamacare Subsidy Overpayments Act
  • Restoring Access to Medication Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Restoring Access to Medication Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Restoring Access to Medication Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the amendments made by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act which disqualify expenses for over-the-counter drugs under health savings accounts and health flexible spending arrangements.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/06/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 164 (Roll no. 351).(text: CR H4325-4326)
10/23/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-308.
03/04/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/11/2016SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 550.
07/07/2016SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
07/06/2016-3:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/06/2016-3:44pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 164 (Roll no. 351). (text: CR H4325-4326)
07/06/2016-3:23pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H4330)
07/06/2016-2:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1270.
07/06/2016-2:47pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1270 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 114-60 shall be considered as adopted.
07/06/2016-2:46pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 793. (consideration: CR H4325-4331)
07/05/2016-7:15pmHouseRule H. Res. 793 passed House.
06/21/2016-9:40pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 793 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1270 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 114-60 shall be considered as adopted.
10/23/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 234.
10/23/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-308.
09/17/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/17/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/27/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/04/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
03/04/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/10/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/23/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/14/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/14/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/01/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/05/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/21/2015
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/01/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/18/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 06/25/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/08/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/08/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/08/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/08/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/08/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/08/2015
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/08/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/09/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/10/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/13/2015
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/14/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/16/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/16/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/23/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/23/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/28/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/29/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 09/11/2015
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 09/11/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 09/17/2015
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 09/17/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/17/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/17/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/17/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/17/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 09/17/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/22/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/28/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means03/04/2015 Referred to
09/17/2015 Markup by
10/23/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-308
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/27/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1270. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/06/2016)

Restoring Access to Medication and Improving Health Savings Act of 2016

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to modify the rules that apply to health savings accounts (HSAs) and overpayments of subsidies under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.

Restoring Access to Medication Act of 2016

The bill repeals provisions of the Internal Revenue Code, as added by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, that limit payments for medications from HSAs, medical savings accounts, and health flexible spending arrangements to only prescription drugs or insulin (thus allowing distributions from such accounts for over-the-counter drugs).

Health Care Security Act of 2016

The bill modifies the rules for HSAs with respect to catch-up contributions for married couples, medical expenses incurred before an HSA is established, and contribution limits.

If both spouses of a married couple have family coverage under a high deductible health plan, each spouse may make catch-up contributions to the same HSA. (Catch-up contributions are additional contributions which individuals who are at least 55 years of age may make to an HSA.)

If an HSA is established within 60 days of the beginning of coverage under a high deductible health plan, any distribution from the HSA used to pay a qualified medical expense incurred during that 60-day period after the health coverage began is excludible from gross income. (Under current law, the medical expense must be incurred on or after the date that the HSA is established.)

The bill increases the maximum contribution limits for HSAs to equal the maximum for the sum of the annual deductible and out-of-pocket expenses that may be required to be paid for covered benefits under a high deductible health plan.

Protecting Taxpayers by Recovering Improper Obamacare Subsidy Overpayments Act

The bill eliminates the limitation on the increase in tax imposed upon certain low-income families for advance payments of the tax credit for health insurance premium assistance that exceed the allowable amount of such credit.