There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Songwriter Equity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 17, United States Code, to ensure fairness in the establishment of certain rates and fees under sections 114 and 115 of such title, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/04/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/31/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/04/2015 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/10/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/24/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/24/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/13/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/23/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/05/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/12/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/13/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/19/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/01/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/12/2015
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/16/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/25/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/07/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/07/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/01/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 10/06/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/01/2015
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4] 12/02/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/08/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/18/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/05/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/13/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/27/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/07/2016
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/21/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/21/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/14/2016
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 12/02/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/04/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet03/31/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Contracts and agency
  • Intellectual property
  • Judges
  • Music
  • Sound recording

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1283. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/04/2015)

Songwriter Equity Act of 2015

Amends federal copyright law regarding the exclusive rights of sound recording copyright owners to remove a provision that prohibits license fees payable for the public performance of sound recordings, by means of a digital audio transmission, from being taken into account in any administrative, judicial, or other governmental proceeding to set or adjust the royalties payable to copyright owners of musical works for the public performance of their works.

Requires Copyright Royalty Judges (CRJs), when setting royalty rates under the compulsory license available for the reproduction and distribution of musical works (commonly referred to as a "mechanical license"), to establish rates and terms that most clearly represent the rates and terms that would have been negotiated in the marketplace between a willing buyer and seller.

Requires CRJs, in establishing such rates and terms, to base their decision on marketplace, economic, and use information presented by the participants. Allows consideration of comparable uses and circumstances under voluntary license agreements.