There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Short Titles as Introduced

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire approximately 44 acres of land in Martinez, California, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
08/30/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/14/2016 without amendment. With written report No. 114-312.
09/16/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5996)
07/21/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-213.
03/04/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/30/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 584.
08/30/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/14/2016 without amendment. With written report No. 114-312.
07/13/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/17/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-496.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
09/17/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/16/2015-3:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/16/2015-3:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5996)
09/16/2015-3:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1289.
09/16/2015-3:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5996-5997)
09/16/2015-3:46pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/21/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160.
07/21/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-213.
06/11/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/11/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/11/2015HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
06/10/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/18/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/04/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/04/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (31)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/04/2015 Referred to
06/11/2015 Markup by
07/21/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-213
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/18/2015 Referred to
06/11/2015 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/17/2015 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
08/30/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-312
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks03/17/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1289. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (08/30/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 21, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

The Department of the Interior may acquire by donation approximately 44 acres of land to include in the John Muir National Historic Site in Martinez, California.

The acquired land shall be administered as part of such site.