Text: H.R.1289 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (08/30/2016)

Calendar No. 584

114th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 1289

[Report No. 114–312]


To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire approximately 44 acres of land in Martinez, California, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

September 17, 2015

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources

August 30, 2016

Reported under authority of the order of the Senate of July 14, 2016, by Ms. Murkowski, without amendment


AN ACT

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire approximately 44 acres of land in Martinez, California, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act”.

SEC. 2. John Muir National Historic Site land acquisition.

(a) Acquisition.—The Secretary of the Interior may acquire by donation the approximately 44 acres of land, and interests in such land, that are identified on the map entitled “John Muir National Historic Site Proposed Boundary Expansion”, numbered 426/127150, and dated November, 2014.

(b) Boundary.—Upon the acquisition of the land authorized by subsection (a), the Secretary of the Interior shall adjust the boundaries of the John Muir Historic Site in Martinez, California, to include the land identified on the map referred to in subsection (a).

(c) Administration.—The land and interests in land acquired under subsection (a) shall be administered as part of the John Muir National Historic Site established by the Act of August 31, 1964 (Public Law 88–547; 78 Stat. 753; 16 U.S.C. 461 note).


Calendar No. 584

114th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 1289
[Report No. 114–312]

AN ACT
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire approximately 44 acres of land in Martinez, California, and for other purposes.

August 30, 2016
Reported without amendment