There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Microbead-Free Waters Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Microbead-Free Waters Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Microbead-Free Waters Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Microbead-Free Waters Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to prohibit the manufacture and introduction or delivery for introduction into interstate commerce of rinse-off cosmetics containing intentionally-added plastic microbeads.

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the sale or distribution of cosmetics containing synthetic plastic microbeads.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/28/2015 Became Public Law No: 114-114. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2015 Signed by President.
12/22/2015 Presented to President.
12/18/2015 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8861)
12/07/2015 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9021)
12/07/2015 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-371.
03/04/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
12/28/2015 Became Public Law No: 114-114. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2015 Signed by President.
12/22/2015 House Presented to President.
12/18/2015 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2015 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8861)
12/08/2015 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
12/07/2015-4:11pm House The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2015-4:11pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2015-4:11pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9021)
12/07/2015-4:01pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1321.
12/07/2015-4:01pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9021-9022)
12/07/2015-4:01pm House Mr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/07/2015 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 283.
12/07/2015 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-371.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/18/2015 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/18/2015 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/17/2015 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/06/2015 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/04/2015 House Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/04/2015 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/04/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 04/29/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/01/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/02/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/02/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/02/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/03/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/04/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/10/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/11/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/11/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/11/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/17/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/17/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/17/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/17/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/17/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/18/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/18/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/23/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/24/2015
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/25/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 06/25/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/07/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/07/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/14/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/14/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 07/27/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/31/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/08/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/08/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/24/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/24/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/07/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/04/2015 Referred to
11/18/2015 Markup by
12/07/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-371
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/06/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (5)

  • Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
  • Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
  • Marine pollution
  • Water quality

Latest Summary (4)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1321. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/18/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on December 7, 2015. The summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

Microbead-Free Waters Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to ban rinse-off cosmetics that contain intentionally-added plastic microbeads beginning on January 1, 2018, and to ban manufacturing of these cosmetics beginning on July 1, 2017. These bans are delayed by one year for cosmetics that are over-the-counter drugs.