There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To adjust the boundary of the Arapaho National Forest, Colorado, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/16/2015Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-194.
04/28/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 30 (Roll no. 175).(text: CR H2488)
04/15/2015Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-80.
03/04/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/16/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 339.
12/16/2015SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-194.
11/19/2015SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/08/2015SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-490.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
04/29/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
04/28/2015-7:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/28/2015-7:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 30 (Roll no. 175). (text: CR H2488)
04/28/2015-6:59pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2490)
04/28/2015-5:03pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/28/2015-4:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1324.
04/28/2015-4:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2488-2489)
04/28/2015-4:57pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/15/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 59.
04/15/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-80.
03/25/2015HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
03/25/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/25/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/24/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/18/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/04/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/04/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/04/2015 Referred to
03/25/2015 Markup by
04/15/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-80
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/18/2015 Referred to
03/25/2015 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/29/2015 Referred to
11/19/2015 Markup by
12/16/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-194
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining10/08/2015 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1324. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (12/16/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill adjusts the boundary of the Arapaho National Forest in Colorado to incorporate approximately 92.95 acres of specified land. The Department of Agriculture shall include all federal land within such boundary in the Bowen Gulch Protection Area established under the Colorado Wilderness Act of 1993.

The bill declares that nothing in this Act opens privately owned lands within the boundary to public motorized use or denies motorized access through boundary lands for owners of any non-federal lands within the boundary who historically have had such access.