Text: H.R.1324 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (12/16/2015)

Calendar No. 339

114th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1324

[Report No. 114–194]


To adjust the boundary of the Arapaho National Forest, Colorado, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

April 29, 2015

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources

December 16, 2015

Reported by Ms. Murkowski, without amendment


AN ACT

To adjust the boundary of the Arapaho National Forest, Colorado, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015”.

SEC. 2. Arapaho National Forest boundary adjustment.

(a) In general.—The boundary of the Arapaho National Forest in the State of Colorado is adjusted to incorporate the approximately 92.95 acres of land generally depicted as “The Wedge” on the map entitled “Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment” and dated November 6, 2013, and described as lots three, four, eight, and nine of section 13, Township 4 North, Range 76 West, Sixth Principal Meridian, Colorado. A lot described in this subsection may be included in the boundary adjustment only after the Secretary of Agriculture obtains written permission for such action from the lot owner or owners.

(b) Bowen Gulch Protection Area.—The Secretary of Agriculture shall include all Federal land within the boundary described in subsection (a) in the Bowen Gulch Protection Area established under section 6 of the Colorado Wilderness Act of 1993 (16 U.S.C. 539j).

(c) Land and Water Conservation Fund.—For purposes of section 200306(a)(2)(B)(i) of title 54, United States Code, the boundaries of the Arapaho National Forest, as modified under subsection (a), shall be considered to be the boundaries of the Arapaho National Forest as in existence on January 1, 1965.

(d) Public motorized use.—Nothing in this Act opens privately owned lands within the boundary described in subsection (a) to public motorized use.

(e) Access to non-Federal lands.—Notwithstanding the provisions of section 6(f) of the Colorado Wilderness Act of 1993 (16 U.S.C. 539j(f)) regarding motorized travel, the owners of any non-Federal lands within the boundary described in subsection (a) who historically have accessed their lands through lands now or hereafter owned by the United States within the boundary described in subsection (a) shall have the continued right of motorized access to their lands across the existing roadway.


Calendar No. 339

114th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 1324
[Report No. 114–194]

AN ACT
To adjust the boundary of the Arapaho National Forest, Colorado, and for other purposes.

December 16, 2015
Reported without amendment
Share This