There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Women Veterans Access to Quality Care Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the provision of health care for women veterans by the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/13/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/19/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/13/2015Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/13/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/21/2015
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/28/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/28/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/30/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/30/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/30/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/29/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/29/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 05/29/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/29/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/29/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/09/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/09/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 06/09/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/09/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/15/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 06/15/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/17/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/17/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 06/17/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/09/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/09/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/09/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 07/09/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/13/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 07/13/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/14/2015
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/14/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/14/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 07/14/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/14/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/15/2015
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/15/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/15/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/15/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/15/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/15/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/15/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/16/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/16/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/16/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/16/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/16/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/16/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/21/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/21/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/21/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/22/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/22/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/22/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/22/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 07/22/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/22/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/22/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/22/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/22/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/27/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/27/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/27/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/27/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 07/27/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/27/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/27/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/27/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/27/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/29/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/29/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/29/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/29/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/29/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/29/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/29/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/29/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/29/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/29/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/29/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/29/2015
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/29/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/29/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 07/29/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/31/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/31/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/31/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 07/31/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/08/2015
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/11/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/28/2015
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/07/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/07/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/05/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/19/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/14/2016
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/14/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/14/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/14/2016
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 04/20/2016
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/27/2016
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/03/2016
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 05/16/2016
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/06/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/29/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/06/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/13/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/19/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1356. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2015)

Women Veterans Access to Quality Care Act of 2015

Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) establish standards to ensure that all VA medical facilities have the structural characteristics necessary to adequately meet the gender-specific health care needs of veterans at such facilities, including privacy, safety, and dignity; (2) integrate such standards into its prioritization methodology with respect to requests for funding major medical facility projects and major medical facility leases; and (3) report on such standards, including regarding the facilities that fail to meet such standards and the costs of projects and leases required to meet them.

Requires the VA to: (1) use health outcomes for women veterans furnished health care by the the VA in evaluating the performance of VA medical center directors, (2) publish on its website information on such performance and on health outcomes for women veterans for each VA medical facility, (3) ensure that every VA medical center has a full-time obstetrician or gynecologist, and (4) carry out a pilot program to increase the number of residency program positions and graduate medical education positions for obstetricians and gynecologists at VA medical facilities in not less than three Veterans Integrated Service Networks.

Directs the VA to develop procedures to share information that includes military service and separation data, personal email addresses and telephone numbers, and mailing addresses of veterans with state veterans agencies in electronic format as a means of facilitating the furnishing of assistance and benefits to such veterans. Allows a veteran to elect to prevent their information from being shared.

Directs the Government Accountability Office to carry out an examination of whether VA medical centers are able to meet the health care needs of women veterans.