There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Judicial Redress Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Judicial Redress Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Judicial Redress Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Judicial Redress Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Judicial Redress Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Judicial Redress Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend Privacy Act remedies to citizens of certified states, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (10)

Date
02/24/2016Became Public Law No: 114-126. (TXT | PDF)
02/24/2016Signed by President.
02/12/2016Presented to President.
02/10/2016Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H694)
02/09/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S756-757; text as passed Senate: CR S756-757)
02/01/2016Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment. Without written report.
10/20/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6985-6986)
10/20/2015Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
10/20/2015Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-294, Part I.
03/18/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber
02/24/2016Became Public Law No: 114-126. (TXT | PDF)
02/24/2016Signed by President.
02/12/2016HousePresented to President.
02/10/2016-5:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/10/2016-5:38pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H694)
02/10/2016-5:38pmHouseMr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H694)
02/10/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/09/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S756-757; text as passed Senate: CR S756-757)
02/01/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 356.
02/01/2016SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/28/2016SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/21/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
10/20/2015-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/20/2015-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6985-6986)
10/20/2015-4:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1428.
10/20/2015-4:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6985-6988)
10/20/2015-4:01pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/20/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 223.
10/20/2015HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
10/20/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-294, Part I.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/17/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/17/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/16/2015HouseSubcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice Discharged.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/29/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/18/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/18/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/18/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/18/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/18/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/15/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/17/2015

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/18/2015 Referred to
09/17/2015 Markup by
10/20/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-294
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice04/29/2015 Referred to
09/16/2015 Discharged from
House Oversight and Government Reform03/18/2015 Referred to
10/20/2015 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary10/21/2015 Referred to
01/28/2016 Markup by
02/01/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1428. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-126 (02/24/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on February 1, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.) 

Judicial Redress Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Justice (DOJ) to designate foreign countries or regional economic integration organizations whose natural citizens may bring civil actions under the Privacy Act of 1974 against certain U.S. government agencies for purposes of accessing, amending, or redressing unlawful disclosures of records transferred from a foreign country to the United States to prevent, investigate, detect, or prosecute criminal offenses.

The citizens of such countries or organizations may bring a civil action against: (1) U.S. agencies that intentionally or willfully violate conditions for disclosing records without the consent of the individual to whom the record pertains; and (2) U.S. agencies designated by DOJ, with the concurrence of the agency, that refuse an individual's request to review or amend his or her records.

DOJ, with the concurrence of the Department of State, the Department of the Treasury, and the Department of Homeland Security, may designate countries or organizations whose citizens may pursue such civil remedies if the person's country or organization: (1) has appropriate privacy protections for sharing information with the United States, as provided for in an agreement with the United States or as determined by DOJ; (2) permits the transfer of personal data for commercial purposes between its territory and the United States; and (3) has DOJ-certified data transfer policies that do not impede U.S. national security interests.

A country's designation may be revoked if it: (1) is not complying with a privacy protection agreement, (2) no longer has appropriate privacy protections for sharing information, (3) fails to meet requirements for transfers of personal data for commercial purposes, (4) no longer meets the DOJ's transfer policy certification requirements, or (5) impedes the transfer of information to the United States (for purposes of reporting or preventing unlawful activity) by a private entity or person.

DOJ's designations are exempt from judicial or administrative review.

The U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia is granted exclusive jurisdiction over any claim arising under this Act.