Committees: H.R.1428 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/18/2015 Referred to
09/17/2015 Markup by
10/20/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-294
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice04/29/2015 Referred to
09/16/2015 Discharged from
House Oversight and Government Reform03/18/2015 Referred to
10/20/2015 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary10/21/2015 Referred to
01/28/2016 Markup by
02/01/2016 Reported by