There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Democracy Restoration Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To secure the Federal voting rights of persons when released from incarceration.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/19/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/21/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/19/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2015Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E367)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/19/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/23/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/23/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/23/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/13/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/14/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/09/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/28/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 09/28/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/01/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/30/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/02/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2016
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/24/2016
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/14/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/21/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/18/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/18/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/18/2016
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/24/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/07/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/06/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/07/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/12/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/12/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/12/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/12/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/12/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/12/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/12/2016
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/08/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/08/2016
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/14/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 12/07/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/19/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice04/21/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1459. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/19/2015)

Democracy Restoration Act of 2015

Declares that the right of a U.S. citizen to vote in any election for federal office shall not be denied or abridged because that individual has been convicted of a criminal offense unless, at the time of the election, such individual is serving a felony sentence in a correctional institution or facility. Provides for enforcement of, and remedies for violations of, this Act.

Prohibits this Act from being construed to prohibit a state from enacting any state law that affords the right to vote in any election for federal office on terms less restrictive than those terms established by this Act. Declares that the rights and remedies established by this Act shall be in addition to all other rights and remedies provided by law and shall not supersede, restrict, or limit the application of the Voting Rights Act of 1965 or the National Voter Registration Act of 1993.

Sets forth requirements for state and federal notification of individuals of the restoration of their voting rights.

Prohibits any state, local government, or other person from receiving or using any federal funds to construct or improve a place of incarceration unless that person has in effect a program to notify each U.S. citizen incarcerated in that person's jurisdiction, upon release from such incarceration, of that individual's rights under this Act.