There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Inclusive Prosperity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose a tax on certain trading transactions to invest in our families and communities, improve our infrastructure and our environment, strengthen our financial security, expand opportunity and reduce market volatility.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/19/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/19/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/19/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/19/2015
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/13/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/13/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/15/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/16/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/21/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/23/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/28/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/30/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/12/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/13/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/15/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/18/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/18/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/17/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/10/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/08/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 09/08/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/08/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/09/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/18/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/18/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 10/29/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/07/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means03/19/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1464. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/19/2015)

Inclusive Prosperity Act of 2015

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) impose an excise tax on the transfer of ownership in certain securities (covered transaction), including any share of stock in a corporation, any partnership or beneficial interest in a partnership or trust, any note, bond, debenture, or other evidence of indebtedness (excluding tax-exempt municipal bonds), or derivative financial instruments; (2) impose a penalty on taxpayers who fail to include a covered transaction on their tax return or information statement; and (3) allow an individual taxpayer whose modified adjusted gross income does not exceed $50,000 ($75,000 for married taxpayers filing joint returns) a tax credit for the amount of tax paid on covered transactions.