There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Honor the Nevada Enabling Act of 1864 Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Agriculture and the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain Federal lands to the State of Nevada in fulfillment of the Nevada Statehood Enabling Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/19/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
11/15/2016Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
04/07/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/07/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/19/2015Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4] 03/25/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/06/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/19/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/07/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources04/07/2015 Referred to
11/15/2016 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1484.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1484. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/19/2015)

Honor the Nevada Enabling Act of 1864 Act

Directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) and the Department of the Interior to convey, in phases and without consideration, to the state of Nevada all interest of the United States in federal lands owned, managed, or controlled by the federal government through the USDA or Interior for the purpose of permitting the state to use them to support select beneficiaries. Specifies exceptions, including components of the National Wilderness Preservation System, National Park System, and National Wildlife System, and federally recognized Indian reservations and lands.

Defines "select beneficiaries" as

  • public elementary and secondary education;
  • public higher education;
  • public specialized education;
  • public mental and medical health services;
  • social, senior, and veterans services;
  • public programs for recovery plan development and implementation for candidate and threatened or endangered species; and
  • political subdivisions of the state, but only with respect to payment for services and infrastructure on conveyed identified federal lands that would otherwise be financed through property taxes or other revenues available to a political subdivision of the state.